EP0659629 - Electric power steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuoka, Hirofumi, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | 02 /
Nishimoto, Mitsuhiko, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120252.5 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930327934 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 32793493 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0659629 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0659629 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659629 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/08, // B62D153:00 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B62D5/0466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Elektrische Servolenkung | [1995/26] | English: | Electric power steering apparatus | [1995/26] | French: | Direction assistée électrique | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2188890 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 1 - line 27 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 13 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 125 * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]JPH02290779 ; | [PA]DE4402423 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-3 * column 7, line 3 - column 11, line 60; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910213), vol. 015, no. 061, Database accession no. (M - 1081), & JP02290779 A 19901130 (KAYABA IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |