EP0659737 - Catecholamine surrogates useful as beta 3 agonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/26] | Catecholamine surrogates useful as B3 agonists | ||
[2002/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Washburn, William N. 120 Pleasant Valley Road Titusville, NJ 08650 / US | 02 /
Girotra, Ravindar N. 401 Sturwood Way Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 03 /
Sher, Philip M. 18 Mifflin Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 04 /
Mikkilineni, Amarendra B. 1230 Sycamore Avenue Easton, PA 18042 / US | 05 /
Poss, Kathleen M. 15 Valerie Lane Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 06 /
Mathur, Arvind 632 Newmans Lane Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 07 /
Gavai, Ashvinikumar 10 Tennyson Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 08 /
Bisacchi, Gregory S. 130 Mountain Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | [1995/28] |
Former [1995/26] | 01 /
Washburn, William N. 120 Pleasant Valley Road Titusville, NJ 08650 / US | ||
02 /
Girotra, Ravindar N. 401 Sturwood Way Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
03 /
Sher, Philip M. 18 Mifflin Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | |||
04 /
Mikkilineni, Amarendra B. 1230 Sycamore Avenue Easton, PA 18042 / US | |||
05 /
Poss, Kathleen M. 15 Valerie Lane Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
06 /
Mathur, Arvind 632 Newmans Lane Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
07 /
Gavai, Ashvinikumar 10 Tennyson Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | |||
08 /
Bisacchi, Gregory S. 12133 Taylor Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120281.4 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930171285 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: US 171285 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0659737 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0659737 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659737 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/21, C07C311/08, C07C311/10, A61K31/18 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07C311/13 (EP,US);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D213/69 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/66 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Catecholaminersatz-Verbindungen, nützlich als beta 3 Agonisten | [2002/33] | English: | Catecholamine surrogates useful as beta 3 agonists | [2002/33] | French: | Substituts pour Catécholamines utiles comme agonistes beta 3 | [2002/33] |
Former [1995/26] | Catecholaminersatz-Verbindungen, nützlich als B3 Agonisten | ||
Former [1995/26] | Catecholamine surrogates useful as B3 agonists | ||
Former [1995/26] | Substituts pour Catécholamines utiles comme agonistes B3 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/01] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | GR | 26.03.2003 | |
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0328251 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0427480 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9310074 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9322277 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,16* the whole document * |