EP0718801 - User interface for a franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [1996/33] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kabacaoglu, Hasbi Ritterstrasse 44 b D-10969 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Freytag, Claus Galvanistrasse 8 D-10587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Von Inten, Wolfgang Jägerweg 30 D-13503 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Knoth, Norbert Leydenallee 70 D-12167 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Epping, Thomas Langgässer Weg 10 D-64347 Griesheim/Hess / DE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120314.3 | 21.12.1994 | [1996/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718801 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0718801 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G07B17/00193 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0029 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00298 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00604 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00701 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/43] |
Former [1996/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Benutzerschnittstelle für eine Frankiermaschine | [1996/26] | English: | User interface for a franking machine | [1996/26] | French: | Interface utelisateur pour une machine à affranchir | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.02.1996 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0571061 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * figures 2,3; claims 1,2 *; | [YD]EP0492439 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [YD] 1-18 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0386390 (FRAMA AG [CH]) [A] 1-18 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 9; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0496575 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * figure 4; claim 1 * |