EP0661449 - Device for detecting misfire of internal combustion engine equipped with double-ended coil and distributorless ignition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku City of Nagoya Aichi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku City of Nagoya Aichi Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Shigeru, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Noriaki, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Inagaki, Hiroshi, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Kondou, Masaru, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120838.1 | 28.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19940243944 | 07.10.1994 Original published format: JP 24394494 | JP19940198848 | 24.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19884894 | JP19940036207 | 08.03.1994 Original published format: JP 3620794 | JP19930333898 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33389893 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661449 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661449 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661449 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02P17/12, F02P15/08 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F02P15/08 (EP,US);
F02P17/12 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02P2017/123 (EP,US);
F02P2017/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/27] | F02P17/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Fehlzündung bei einer inneren Brennkraftmaschine ausgerüstet mit doppelendiger Spule und verteilerlosem Zündsystem | [1999/40] | English: | Device for detecting misfire of internal combustion engine equipped with double-ended coil and distributorless ignition system | [1995/27] | French: | Dispositif pour détecter un raté d'allumage dans un moteur à combustion interne équipé d'un système d'allumage à bobine à deux bouts et sans distributeur | [1995/27] |
Former [1995/27] | Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Fehlzündung bei einer inneren Brennkraftmaschine ausgerüstet mit doppelediger Spule und verteilerlosem Zündsystem | Examination procedure | 28.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH04179864 ; | [A]DE4136835 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0599113 ; | [A]JPH04339175 ; | [A]JPH0526145 ; | [A]US4411247 (KUNITA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [A] 10 * abstract * * column 6, line 19 - line 49; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JPH05223050 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921013), vol. 016, no. 494, Database accession no. (M - 1324), & JP04179864 A 19920626 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930817), vol. 017, no. 447, Database accession no. (M - 1464), & JP05099113 A 19930420 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [A] 1,5,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930414), vol. 017, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 1396), & JP04339175 A 19921126 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [A] 1,5,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930611), vol. 017, no. 306, Database accession no. (M - 1428), & JP05026145 A 19930202 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [A] 1,5,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931210), vol. 017, no. 671, Database accession no. (M - 1525), & JP05223050 A 19930831 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,3,5,7,8,10,12,13 * abstract * |