EP0661205 - Shifting apparatus for a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishimoto, Hitoshi c/o Shimano Inc., 77, Oimatsucho 3 cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120853.0 | 28.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930070375 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 7037593 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661205 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661205 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
B62M25/045 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20037 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20287 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/40] |
Former [1995/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrradgetriebeschaltvorrichtung | [1995/27] | English: | Shifting apparatus for a bicycle | [1995/27] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse pour une bicyclette | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC | 10.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.03.1995 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.03.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2603861 (HURET SACHS SA [FR]) [A] 1,5-7,9-11 * figure - *; | [A]FR2540818 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0361335 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,12-15 * figure - *; | [A]EP0354081 (SACHS IND SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * figure - * |