EP0612185 - Optical scanning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 7550 GD Hengelo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 7550 GD Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 NL-7550 GD Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olbertz, Antonius Hendricus Maria Deldenerstraat 255 NL-7555 AE Hengelo / NL | [1994/34] | Application number, filing date | 94200286.6 | 03.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | NL19930000312 | 19.02.1993 Original published format: NL 9300312 | [1994/34] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612185 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612185 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N3/15, H04N1/04 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H04N23/698 (EP);
H04N25/48 (US);
H04N23/20 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US)
|
Former IPC [1994/34] | H04N5/225, H04N3/15, H04N1/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | Optisches Abtastgerät | [1994/34] | English: | Optical scanning apparatus | [1994/34] | French: | Appareil de balayage optique | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5735468 ; | [Y]EP0412036 (IBM [US]) |