EP0626312 - Method and apparatus for making a vacuum package filled with granular material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | Vacuum package, method and apparatus for making such vacuum package filled with granular material | ||
[1998/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | [1998/25] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 NL-3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aarts, Mathias Leonardus Cornelis Zweerslaan 7 NL-2733 HN Bilthoven / NL | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94200374.0 | 11.02.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | NL19930000754 | 04.05.1993 Original published format: NL 9300754 | NL19940000194 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: NL 9400194 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0626312 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0626312 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626312 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/08 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
B65B31/08 (EP,US);
B65D81/2038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer mit körnigem Material gefüllten Vakkuumverpackung | [1998/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for making a vacuum package filled with granular material | [1998/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'un emballage sous vide rempli avec un matériau granulaire | [1998/25] |
Former [1994/48] | Vakkuumverpackung, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer solchen mit körnigem Material gefüllten Verpackung | ||
Former [1994/48] | Vacuum package, method and apparatus for making such vacuum package filled with granular material | ||
Former [1994/48] | Emballage sous vide, procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'un tel emballage rempli avec un matériau granulaire | Examination procedure | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.1998 | SE | 17.09.1998 | GB | 11.02.1999 | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/22] | AT | 17.06.1998 | |
SE | 17.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | SE | 17.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3382642 (SHAW FRED B) [Y] 2,3,29,33* column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]DE2034033 (CENTRO CESARE CASSINA) [X] 1,5,28,32 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3,29,33 |