EP0614857 - Apparatus and method for providing a film on a sheet of glass, and the sheet of glass thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIWEX N.V. Wegastraat 15 NL-5015 BS Tilburg / NL | [1994/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bos, Gerrit Wilderen 353 NL-4817 VE Breda / NL | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1994/37] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 94200600.8 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | NL19930000447 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: NL 9300447 | [1994/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614857 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614857 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C19/00 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
C03C19/00 (EP);
C03C17/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beschichtung einer Glasscheibe und auf diese Weise hergestellte Glasscheibe | [1994/37] | English: | Apparatus and method for providing a film on a sheet of glass, and the sheet of glass thus obtained | [1994/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déposer une couche sur un vitrage et le vitrage ainsi obtenu | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB536048 (W.E. CURRAN ET AL.) [X] 1,5-8 * page 2, line 55 - line 100; claim - *; | [X]JPS61209927 ; | [A]US2883799 (WYNNE HUBERT C, et al) [A] 10,11,14 * figures 1,2; claim . *; | [A]EP0448456 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 1 - line 9; figure 3 *; | [X]JPS62191447 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870213), vol. 47, no. 11, Database accession no. (C - 403), & JP61209927 A 19860918 (FUJIKURA KASEI KK) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 39, Database accession no. 87-274411, & JPS62191447 A 19870821 (STANLEY ELEC. K.K) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract * | [A] - R.L. RONCONE ET AL., "EMBOSSED GRATINGS IN SOL-GEL WAVEGUIDES: PRE-EMBOSS HEAT TREATMENT EFFECTS", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, AMSTERDAM NL, pages 111 - 117 [A] 1 |