EP0622120 - A device for shredding paper, in particular valuable papers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUSTERS ENGINEERING B.V. L.J. Costerstraat 6 NL-5916 PS Venlo / NL | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusters, Wilhelmus Martinus Anthonius Burg. van Liebergenstraat 16 NL-5913 AT Venlo / NL | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Veldman-Dijkers, Cornelia G. C., et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Veldman-Dijkers, Cornelia G.C., Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 94201017.4 | 14.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | NL19930000706 | 26.04.1993 Original published format: NL 9300706 | [1994/44] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622120 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622120 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/00 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
B02C18/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Papiervernichter, insbesondere für Wertpapiere | [1994/44] | English: | A device for shredding paper, in particular valuable papers | [1994/44] | French: | Destructeur de papiers en particulier pour papiers de valeur | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.08.1998 | ES | 05.08.1998 | FR | 05.08.1998 | GR | 05.08.1998 | DK | 05.11.1998 | PT | 05.11.1998 | SE | 05.11.1998 | LU | 14.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
ES | 05.08.1998 | ||
GR | 05.08.1998 | ||
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 14.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
ES | 05.08.1998 | ||
GR | 05.08.1998 | ||
DK | 05.11.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/17] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
ES | 05.08.1998 | ||
GR | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
MC | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
ES | 05.08.1998 | ||
GR | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
GR | 05.08.1998 | ||
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
PT | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 31.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1185046 (PAUL SOINSKY) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]DE2214800 (EHINGER ADOLF EBA MASCHF) [A] 7 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0011073 (HATANAKA TAKEFUMI) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE3112918 (SCHWELLING HERMANN) [A] 1,3-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3238531 (SCHWELLING HERMANN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0184786 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 4-6 * page 10, line 11 - page 13, line 8; figure 2 *; | [AD]DE3612431 (LAUFENBERG BERNHARD) [AD] 2,4-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]GB2198681 (NICHOLLS ENGINEERING SERVICES) [AD] 1,3-11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2209963 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE8911848U (H. SCHWELLING) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0434975 |