EP0621671 - Junction box with high protection level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Kunststoffenindustrie Attema Schelluinsestraat 68 NL-4203 NN Gorinchem / NL | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romijn, Jan 5, Dr. Hiemstralaan NL-4205 KJ Gorinchem / NL | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Mertens, Hans Victor, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) J.J. Viottastraat 31 1071 JP Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Mertens, Hans Victor, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 94201108.1 | 21.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | NL19930000677 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: NL 9300677 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621671 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621671 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/10, H02G3/14 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
H02G3/088 (EP);
H02G3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, NL, SE [1994/43] | Title | German: | Installationsdose mit hohem Schutzgrad | [1994/43] | English: | Junction box with high protection level | [1994/43] | French: | Boîtier d'installation à haut degré de protection | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 15.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9107794 (MODELEC SA [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0531555 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 28; figures 1,24-6; claims 1,3 * |