EP0623879 - Microprocessor with secure memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [1999/23] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhelimi, Alain 9, Square Copernic, Résidence Iéna F-78150 Le Chesnaye / FR | [1994/45] | Application number, filing date | 94201181.8 | 29.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | FR19930005556 | 06.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305556 | [1994/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623879 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623879 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
G06F12/1433 (EP);
G06F21/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | Mikroprozessor mit sicherem Speicher | [1994/45] | English: | Microprocessor with secure memory | [1994/45] | French: | Microprocesseur avec mémoire sécurisée | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 07.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0512542 (GAO GESELLSCHAFT FÜR AUTOMATION UND ORGANISATION MBH) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 45 * [A] 2,3 | [XY] - "Memory protection in chip cards", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., ARMONK US, (198910), vol. 32, no. 5A, pages 416 - 417 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3 | [Y] - "Memory map protection circuit", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., ARMONK US, (198704), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 4971 - 4975 [Y] 2,3 * page 4971, line 15 - page 4972, line 11 * * figures 1,2 * |