EP0625837 - Automatic false synchronization correction mechanism for biphase-modulated signal reception [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhebergen, Gertjan c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 94201405.1 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | EP19930201446 | 19.05.1993 Original published format: EP 93201446 | [1994/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0625837 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0625837 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/033, H04L25/49 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
H03L7/08 (EP);
H04L7/0334 (EP);
H03L2207/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/47] | H04L7/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/47] | Title | German: | Automatischer Mechanismus zur Korrektur falscher Synchronisierung für Empfang eines biphasen modulierten Signales | [1994/47] | English: | Automatic false synchronization correction mechanism for biphase-modulated signal reception | [1994/47] | French: | Mécanisme automatique de correction de synchronisation incorrecte pour la réception d'un signal modulé en biphase | [1994/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 22.03.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0162505 (N.V. PHILIPS GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [DY] 1 * page 2, line 15 - line 35 * * page 3, line 8 - line 36 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 5 * [DA] 2-4; | [Y]GB2094110 (ELTRA CORPORATION) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 123 - page 2, line 16 * * page 4, line 27 - line 38 * * page 4, line 102 - line 110 *; | [A]WO8302405 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON) [A] 1 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, column 2 * * claim 1 * |