EP0636384 - Balloon catheter with pressure indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORDIS EUROPA N.V. Oosteinde 8 NL-9301 LJ Roden / NL | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mulder, Martien Weegbree 9 NL-9302 AS Roden / NL | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1995/05] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 94201744.3 | 17.06.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | NL19930001329 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: NL 9301329 | [1995/05] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636384 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, G01L7/16 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
A61M25/10187 (EP,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP,US);
G01L7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/05] | Title | German: | Ballon-Katheter mit Druckanzeigegerät | [1995/05] | English: | Balloon catheter with pressure indicator | [1995/05] | French: | Cathéter à ballon avec indicateur de pression | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4159722 (WALKER) [Y] 1-3 * column 6, line 48 - line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3839612 (HENGSTLER) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4185638 (BRUNER) [A] 1-4 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4552558 (MUTO) [A] * column A; figure - *; | [A]US2136261 (ANDERSON) [A] * figure -; claim - * |