EP0617178 - Wall panel system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herman Miller, Inc. 8500 Byron Road Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states Herman Miller, Inc. 8500 Byron Road Zeeland Michigan 49464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nienhuis, James H. 5046 Chableau Drive Wyoming, Michigan 49509 / US | 02 /
Clark, Jeffrey L. 1252 Marlene Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 03 /
De Pree, Michael L. A-6344 145th Ave. Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 04 /
Beck, Robert L. 8279 Port Sheldon Road Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/39] | 01 /
Nienhuis, James H. 5046 Chableau Drive Wyoming, Michigan 49509 / US | ||
02 /
Clark, Jeffrey L. 1252 Marlene Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | |||
03 /
De Pree, Michael L. 4320 132nd Avenue Hamilton, Michigan 49419 / US | |||
04 /
Beck, Robert L. 8279 Port Sheldon Road Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94201820.1 | 15.05.1991 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | US19900526064 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: US 526064 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617178 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617178 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/61 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
H02G3/288 (EP,US);
E04B2/7425 (EP,US);
E04B2/7438 (EP,US);
E04C2/521 (EP,US);
H01R25/162 (EP,US);
E04B2002/7488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/39] | Title | German: | Wandplattensystem | [1994/39] | English: | Wall panel system | [1994/39] | French: | Système de panneaux muraux | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91304331.1 / EP0457555 | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE659258 (ROCMA) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 23 *; | [X]US3671063 (SLAYDEN JAMES D) [X] 1-4 * column W *; | [A]GB2059183 (STEELCASE INC); | [A]FR2483136 (STRASBOURG FORGES [FR]); | [A]GB2101175 (PROJECT OFFICE FURNITURE LIMIT [GB]) [A] * page 1, line 65 - line 103 *; | [A]US4382648 (PROPST ROBERT L, et al) |