EP0635759 - Method of photographic processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:DE
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:DE
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1995/04] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsden, Peter Douglas, c/o Kodak Limited Patent Department, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 94202125.4 | 20.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | GB19930015366 | 24.07.1993 Original published format: GB 9315366 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635759 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635759 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
G03C7/3017 (EP,US);
Y10S430/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/41] |
Former [1995/04] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Photographisches Behandlungsverfahren | [1995/04] | English: | Method of photographic processing | [1995/04] | French: | Méthode de traitement photographique | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9207299 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-10; | [DA]WO9210790 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al)[DA] 1-3,7 |