EP0641645 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing a shell-shaped package, and such shell-shaped package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jei Lee Corporation 6th Floor-5, No. 61 Chung Cheng Third Road Kaohsiung 80027 / TW | [1995/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheng, Sheng Chi 6th Floor-5, No. 61 Chung Cheng Third Road Kaohsiung 80027 / TW | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94202528.9 | 05.09.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | NL19930001532 | 06.09.1993 Original published format: NL 9301532 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641645 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641645 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B31B25/00, B26D7/18, B26F3/00 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B26F3/002 (EP,US);
B26D7/1827 (EP,US);
B31B2155/00 (EP,US);
B31B2155/002 (EP,US);
B31B2160/30 (EP,US);
B31B2170/00 (EP,US);
B31B2241/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1995/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von schalenförmigen Packungen; und Packung | [1995/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing a shell-shaped package, and such shell-shaped package | [1995/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'emballage en forme de coquille et emballage | [1995/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.1997 | BE | 09.04.1997 | DK | 09.04.1997 | PT | 09.07.1997 | [1998/15] |
Former [1998/10] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
BE | 09.04.1997 | ||
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
PT | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 09.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2501691 (LEHMACHER HANS) [A] 1,5,12 * figure - *; | [A]EP0063251 (GAWARECKI HERBERT)[A] 5,7-11; | [DA]EP0369549 (KLERK S PLASTIC IND B V [NL]) [DA] 1,5,12 |