EP0643379 - Multiple image display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mezzi Alternativi MAIS & Associati s.r.l. via IV Novembre 22 10019 Strambino (Torino) / IT | [1998/02] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states Mezzi Alternativi MAIS & Associati s.r.l. via Bricherasio 7 I-10128 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casati, Giuseppe strada della Verna 28bis/6 I-10156 Torino / IT | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Spandonari, Carlo Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Spandonari, Carlo, Dr. Ing. corso Re Umberto 56 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94202607.1 | 12.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00668 | 14.09.1993 Original published format: IT TO930668 | IT1994TO00403 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: IT TO940403 | [1995/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643379 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643379 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/32 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
G09F11/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1995/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen multipel Abbildungen | [1995/11] | English: | Multiple image display device | [1995/11] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pour présenter des images multiples | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.11.1997 | ES | 26.11.1997 | LI | 26.11.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/45] | CH | 26.11.1997 | |
LI | 26.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR421088 (CARON) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 60; figures 1,2 * [A] 14; | [X]FR676257 (DOUCET) [X] 1-3,14 * page 1, line 47 - page 3, line 18; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]DE1939947U (BRINDÖPKE) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 23; figures 1-5 * [A] 18; | [A]GB1433792 (ANALYSIS DESIGNS (WEMBLEY) LTD.) [A] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 63; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE550288 (STERN) [A] 1-3,5,14 * page 1, lines 47-73; figures 1-4 * |