EP0647740 - Method and apparatus for making a lined trench in the soil; as well as a lined trench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nedland B.V. Havendijk 10A 3846 AD Harderwijk / NL | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Ketel, Jacob Hermen Biesteweg 2 NL-3849 RD Hierden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketel, Jacob Hermen Biesteweg 2 3849 RD Hierden / NL | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1998/03] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1995/15] | Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 94202765.7 | 26.09.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | NL19930001758 | 11.10.1993 Original published format: NL 9301758 | [1995/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647740 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647740 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/05 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
E02D29/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung verkleideter Gräben im Boden sowie verkleidete Gräben | [1998/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for making a lined trench in the soil; as well as a lined trench | [1995/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la réalisation des tranchées revêtues dans le sol; ainsi que tranchées revêtues | [1995/15] |
Former [1995/15] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung überzogener Gräben im Boden sowie überzogene Gräben | Examination procedure | 28.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]BE894870 (S.A.FRANKI N.V. ET BUREAU D'ETUDES GILBERT LESAGE S.A.) [X] 1,14,15 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, paragraph L * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 1 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,7; | [XAY]GB427743 (NOFRANGO LTD.) [X] 8,11 * page 3, line 113 - page 4, line 17 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 2 [Y] 7,9,10,12; | [YA]US1869265 (W.LERICHE ET AL.) [Y] 2,9,10,12 * page 1, line 81 - page 2, line 21 * * figure - * [A] 13; | [XA]DE3446679 (HOCHTIEF AG VORM. GEBR. HELFMANN) [X] 14 * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph L * * figure - * [A] 16; | [A]US1924560 (W.LERICHE ET AL.) [A] 8-13 * figure - * |