EP0652229 - Oligopeptides with fungicidal activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISAGRO S.p.A. Via Felice Casati, 20 20124 Milano / IT | [2000/21] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states ISAGRO S.p.A. Via Felice Casati, 20 I-20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camaggi, Giovanni Via Ragazzi del 99, 20 I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
Filippini, Lucio Via R. Morandi, 13/A I-20097 San Donato Milanese(MI) / IT | 03 /
Gusmeroli, Marilena Via della Guerrina 31 IT-20052 Monza Milano / IT | 04 /
Garavaglia, Carlo Piazza della Vittoria 7 IT-20012 Cuggiono Milano / IT | 05 /
Signorini, Ernesto Via Matteotti 51 IT-21046 Malnate Varese / IT | [1996/48] |
Former [1995/19] | 01 /
Camaggi, Giovanni Via Ragazzi del 99, 20 IT-28100 Novara / IT | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
Gusmeroli, Marilena Via della Guerrina 31 IT-20052 Monza Milano / IT | |||
04 /
Garavaglia, Carlo Piazza della Vittoria 7 IT-20012 Cuggiono Milano / IT | |||
05 /
Signorini, Ernesto Via Matteotti 51 IT-21046 Malnate Varese / IT | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Fusina, Gerolamo Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94202821.8 | 03.10.1994 | [1995/19] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI02113 | 05.10.1993 Original published format: IT MI932113 | [1995/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0652229 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0652229 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652229 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/00, A01N47/12, A01N37/18 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
C07K5/06165 (EP,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N43/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/18 (EP,US);
A01N43/30 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N47/12 (EP,US);
C07C237/22 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06052 (EP,US);
C07K5/0808 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/19] | Extension states | SI | 30.09.1994 | Title | German: | Oligopeptide mit fungizider Aktivität | [1995/19] | English: | Oligopeptides with fungicidal activity | [1995/19] | French: | Oligopeptides ayant l'activité fongicide | [1995/19] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99201985.1 / EP0976760 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH06372607 [ ] (...); | [A]DE3544375 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * tab. I, compounds 33-37, 101-104, 149-151,174,187; claims 1-6 * | [X] - Catalog S13, page 334, SWITZERLAND, BACHEM FEINCHEMIKALIEN AG [X] 1 * compound G-2580 * | [X] - ABDEL-GHAFFAR, S.A., "Synthesis of some dipeptides containing DL-C-phenylglycine", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930705), vol. 119, no. 1, Database accession no. 9137h, page 944 [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - AL-AZHAR BULL. SCI., vol. 2, page 415 | [A] - AZUMA, S. ET AL., "Compositions containing phenylglycines for preventing and treating plant diseases", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19881107), vol. 109, no. 19, Database accession no. 165707t, page 280 [A] * abstract * |