EP0647391 - A construction for automatically milking animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2000/38] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Texas Industries Inc. 15 Pietermaai Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Cornelis 7, Brüschenrain CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1995/15] | Mulder, Herman Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 94202889.5 | 05.10.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | NL19930001752 | 11.10.1993 Original published format: NL 9301752 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0647391 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0647391 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647391 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A01J7/00 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
A01J5/0175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | Konstruktion zum automatischen Melken von Tieren | [1995/15] | English: | A construction for automatically milking animals | [1995/15] | French: | Dispositif de traite automatique d'animaux | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0545916 (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1 * column 6, line 19 - column 8, line 27 * * figures 6-9; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE4113700 (SCHILLINGMANN) [A] 1 * column 19, line 19 - line 33; figure 5B *; | [A]EP0194729 (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1 * page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 18; figures 6,7 *; | [PA]EP0566200 (VAN DER LELY) [PA] 1-7,12,28 * column 6, line 43 - column 10, line 29 * * figure -; claim - * |