EP0710014 - Method for verification of the frequency response of a digital radiographic read out system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vuylsteke, Pieter c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Jacobs, Walter c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., DIE 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1996/18] | Application number, filing date | 94203125.3 | 27.10.1994 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710014 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, H04N17/00, G01T1/29 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
H04N1/00013 (EP,US);
H04N1/00002 (EP,US);
H04N1/00031 (EP,US);
H04N1/00045 (EP,US);
H04N1/00053 (EP,US);
H04N1/00063 (EP,US);
H04N1/00082 (EP,US);
A61B6/583 (EP,US);
H04N17/00 (EP,US);
H04N5/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Frequenzgangprüfung eines digitalen radiographischen Wiedergabesystems | [1996/18] | English: | Method for verification of the frequency response of a digital radiographic read out system | [1996/18] | French: | Méthode de vérification de la réponse en fréquence d'un système numérique de reproduction radiographique | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1994 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 01.06.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1997/31] | 10.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3849650 (PATTEN T); | [YA]EP0460749 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US5140418 (RIVAMONTE LORENZO A [US]); |