EP0652157 - Box-like packaging with dispensing opening and blank for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystal B.V. Westeinde 48 1334 BL Almere / NL | [1997/12] |
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states Weber-Caspers, Martin Gerhard Ringdijk 384 NL-8244 BT Lelystad / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber-Caspers, Martin Gerhard Ringdijk 384 8244 BT Lelystad / NL | [1997/12] |
Former [1995/19] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94203218.6 | 04.11.1994 | [1995/19] | Priority number, date | NL19930001925 | 05.11.1993 Original published format: NL 9301925 | [1995/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0652157 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0652157 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
B65D5/742 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/19] | Title | German: | Dosenartige Verpackung mit Ausgabeöffnung und Zuschnitt zu ihrer Herstellung | [1995/19] | English: | Box-like packaging with dispensing opening and blank for making same | [1995/19] | French: | Boîte d'emballage à ouverture de distribution, et son flan | [1995/19] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/14] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/14] | Request for further processing for: | 13.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3269644 (BUMP EDWARD L) [X] 1,5,11-13,19,21,23 * column 1, line 29 - line 35; figure -; claim 1G * [A] 2,8; | [DA]US3421680 (COHEE DONALD R) [DA] 1-3,5,6,8-12,23* column A; figures 1,4,11-13 * |