EP0710896 - Toner powder bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lieven, Dirk, c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. DIE 3800 Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [1996/19] | Application number, filing date | 94203219.4 | 04.11.1994 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710896 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0710896 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
G03G15/0855 (EP,US);
G03G15/0865 (EP,US);
G03G15/0867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/19] | Title | German: | Tonerpulverflasche | [1996/19] | English: | Toner powder bottle | [1996/19] | French: | Bouteille de poudre de toner | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4060105 (FELDEISEN RONALD F, et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5089854 (KAIEDA SHOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US4615364 (KAWATA SHUN [JP]) [DA] 1 * figure - * |