EP0657211 - Catalytic system comprising a supported hydrogenation catalyst and hydrodechlorination process of chlorofluorohydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2000/21] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoebrechts, Jean-Paul Allée des Vignes 7 B-1390 Grez-Doiceau / BE | 02 /
Wilmet, Vincent rue Cour Boisacq 81 B-1301 Wavre / BE | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1995/24] | Anthoine, Paul, et al SOLVAY S.A. Département de la Propiété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 94203490.1 | 01.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | BE19930001374 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: BE 9301374 | [1995/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657211 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657211 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/12, B01J27/125, B01J27/138, C07C17/00 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B01J27/125 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/58 (KR);
B01J27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J27/138 (EP,US);
C07C17/00 (KR);
C07C17/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/24] | Title | German: | Hydrierungsträgerkatalysator enthaltendes Katalysatorssystem und Verfahren zur Hydrodechlorierung von Fluorchlorkohlenwasserstoffen | [1995/24] | English: | Catalytic system comprising a supported hydrogenation catalyst and hydrodechlorination process of chlorofluorohydrocarbons | [1995/24] | French: | Système catalytique comprenant un catalyseur d'hydrogénation sur un support et procédé d'hydrodéchloration d'hydrocarbures chlorofluorés | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2000 | BE | 31.12.2000 | [2002/03] |
Former [2001/11] | AT | 24.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB621902 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) [X] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0053657 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] * claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0343707 (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1,11-14 * claim 1 * * page 3, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]GB2219796 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0349115 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 8 * claims 1-6 *; | [XY]EP0548743 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 40 - line 42 * * claims 6-8 * [Y] 8 |