EP0661740 - Thermal management of electronic components using synthetic diamond [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Industrial Ceramics, Inc. 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Industrial Ceramics, Inc. 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Industrial Ceramics, Inc. 1 New Bond Street, P.O. Box 15008 Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain/Norton Industrial Ceramics Corporation 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Matthew 15, Blacksmith Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69 Rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | ||
Former [1998/13] | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | ||
Former [1996/03] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | ||
Former [1995/27] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 94203695.5 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | US19930175587 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: US 175587 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661740 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661740 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661740 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373, H01L21/48 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
H01L23/3732 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1092 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/27] | H01L23/373 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Thermische Kontrolle von elektronischen Komponenten unter Verwendung von synthetischem Diamant | [1995/27] | English: | Thermal management of electronic components using synthetic diamond | [1995/27] | French: | Contrôle thermique de composants électroniques utilisant un diamant synthétique | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS649882 ; | [A]FR2634064 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0495479 (NORTON CO [US]); | [A]JPS60208852 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), & JP01009882 A 19890113 (KOBE STEEL) [A] 1-26 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860307), vol. 010, no. 058, Database accession no. (E - 386), & JP60208852 A 19851021 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN ET AL.) |