EP0664526 - Method and apparatus for three-dimensional personalized video games using 3-D models and depth measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellson, Richard N., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Parulski, Kenneth A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Baumeister, Hans Peter, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/30] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94203760.7 | 24.12.1994 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | US19940183540 | 19.01.1994 Original published format: US 183540 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0664526 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0664526 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/40, G06T15/70, G06T7/00, G01B5/207, G01B7/287 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
G06T13/40 (EP);
G01B5/207 (EP);
G06T15/205 (EP);
A63F2300/695 (EP);
G05B2219/49025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/30] | G06T17/40, G06T15/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für dreidimensionales personifiziertes dreidimensionales Spiel mit 3-D-Modellen und Tiefemessungsgerät | [1995/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for three-dimensional personalized video games using 3-D models and depth measuring apparatus | [1995/30] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour jeu vidéo personnalisé tri-dimensionnel utilisant des modèles 3-D et appareil de mesure de profondeur | [1995/30] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2246933 (RANK CINTEL) [A] 1-5,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4872056 (VIDEO GRAPHICS STYLING); | [A]EP0568356 (CANON); | [X]JPS58135406 ; | [X]US4017978 (ELF AQUITAINE) [X] 13,14 * column W * | [A] - CAUDELL E.A, "neural modelling of face animation for telecommuting in virtual reality", IEEE VIRTUAL REALITY ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, NEW-YORK US, (19930918), pages 478 - 485, XP000457716 [A] 1-5,15,16 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831105), vol. 7, no. 249, Database accession no. (P - 234)<1394> , & JP58135406 A 00000000 (KITADA) [X] 6 * the whole document * | [A] - TAGARE AND FIGEIREDO, "SIMULTANEOUS ESTIMATION OF SHAPE AND REFLECTANCE MAPS FROM PHOTOMETRIC STEREO", THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, NEW-YORK, (19901204), pages 340 - 343, XP000242616 [A] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.1990.139546 |