EP0660294 - Advertising cabinet with integral garbage container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernadotte, Evelyn Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 15a D-14193 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Bernadotte, Thomas Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 15a D-14193 Berlin / DE | [1995/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/14] |
Former [1995/26] | Scholz, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Rheinstrasse 64 D-12159 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94250086.9 | 02.04.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | DE19930019943U | 21.12.1993 Original published format: DE 9319943 U | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660294 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09F15/00, B65F1/14 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B65F1/006 (EP);
B65F1/1426 (EP);
G09F13/045 (EP);
G09F15/0043 (EP);
B65F2210/104 (EP);
Y02W30/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/26] | Title | German: | Werbeschaukasten mit integrierten Kleinabfallbehältern | [1995/26] | English: | Advertising cabinet with integral garbage container | [1995/26] | French: | Vitrine publicitaire avec conteneur intégré pour déchets | [1995/26] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/38] | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.02.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE9115348U (E. WEBER ET AL.) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO8808188 (ADJIMAN ALEXANDRE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2242771 (NEW AD ADVERTISING CO LIMITED [IE]); | [E]DE9405904U (BERNADOTTE EVELYN [DE], et al) [E] 1-10 * the whole document * |