EP0641904 - Plane-shaped, flexible floor covering formed of surface portions capable of being assembled [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states debolon dessauer bodenbeläge GmbH Ebertallee 209 D-06846 Dessau / DE | [1998/12] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states Debolon Dessauer Bodenbeläge GmbH Ebertallee 209 D-06846 Dessau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopf, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Gropiusallee 73 D-06846 Dessau / DE | [1998/12] |
Former [1995/10] | 01 /
Kopf, Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Gropiusallee 73 D-06846 Dessau / DE | Representative(s) | Burghardt, Rosemarie, et al Anwaltskanzlei Burghardt & Burghardt P.O. B. 820119 12503 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Burghardt, Rosemarie, Dipl.-Jur., et al Burghardt & Burghardt P.O.B. 16 D-12491 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 94250214.7 | 29.08.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | DE19930013471U | 01.09.1993 Original published format: DE 9313471 U | [1995/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641904 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641904 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/10, E01C5/20 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
E04F15/10 (EP);
B29C65/56 (EP);
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C66/2272 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B29C66/435 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/10] | Title | German: | Flächenförmiger, aus Teilflächen bestehender, montagefähiger, flexibler Fussbodenbelag | [1995/10] | English: | Plane-shaped, flexible floor covering formed of surface portions capable of being assembled | [1995/10] | French: | Revêtement de sol flexible de forme plane, composé par des portions de surface et capable d'être assemblé | [1998/12] |
Former [1995/10] | Revêtement de sol flexible de forme plane, composé par des portitions de surface et capable d'être assemblé | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.03.1998 | GB | 18.03.1998 | IT | 18.03.1998 | NL | 18.03.1998 | DK | 18.06.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
NL | 18.03.1998 | ||
DK | 18.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
NL | 18.03.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 18.03.1998 | |
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 14.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2653991 (BERLEBURGER SCHAUMSTOFFWERK GMBH) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * * page 6, line 22 - page 10, line 22; figure .; claim 1 * [Y] 2; | [YA]EP0210398 (ISPO GMBH) [Y] 2 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 32; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,3; | [Y]FR2108916 (SOCIÉTÉ CHIMIQUE DE GERLAND) [Y] 1,3 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 31; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE2724381 (VKI-RHEINHOLD & MAHLA AG) [Y] 1,3 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 27; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5052158 (D'LUZANSKY) [Y] 1,3 * column 4, line 21 - column 8, line 15; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US2680698 (FRANCIS SCHNEE ROBERT) [Y] 1,3 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3657852 (WORTHINGTON ET AL.) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 67; figures 1-3 * |