EP0608140 - Mechanical foam fire fighting equipment and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCA, INC. 1675 Texla Road Vidor Texas 77662 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states CCA, INC. 1675 Texla Road Vidor, Texas 77662 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Kenneth C. 426 Avenue B Port Neches, Texas 77651 / US | 02 /
Williams, Dwight 1530 Texla Road Vidor, Texas 77662 / US | 03 /
Williams, Leslie P. 1534 Texla Road Vidor, Texas 77662 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300452.3 | 21.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | US19930007591 | 22.01.1993 Original published format: US 7591 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0608140 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0608140 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/12, A62C3/06, A62C5/02, A62C39/00, B05B7/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
A62C31/12 (EP,US);
B05B7/0031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/30] | A62C31/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/30] | Title | German: | Mechanische Schaumfeuerlöschvorrichtung und Verfahren | [1994/30] | English: | Mechanical foam fire fighting equipment and method | [1994/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'extinction à mousse mécanique | [1994/30] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/10] | 09.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.07.1996 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2961050 (MACCRACKEN CALVIN D) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 59; figure - *; | [Y]US3438445 (MACCRACKEN CALVIN D) [Y] 3,5,6,12,14 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 75; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE1759749 (REUTER WERNER) [Y] 16,18 * page 2, paragraph 6; figure 4 *; | [XY]AU480541 (JOHN KERR & CO (MANCHESTER) LTD) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,10-18; | [A]DE3620574 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE])[A] 1,9; | [Y]FR2608438 (STERLINI JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 2-4,11-13,15,17 * the whole document *; | [YD]US4828038 (WILLIAMS LESLIE P [US]) [YD] 7,8,10 * column 3, line 30 - column 7 *; | [Y]DE4012852 (UNIV MAGDEBURG TECH [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5113945 (CABLE BRIAN [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 58; figure - * | [Y] - "A dual role for the Kongsberg gas turbine - prime mover and inert gas generator", THE MOTOR SHIP, vol. 52, page 160 [Y] 16,18 * the whole document * |