EP0622912 - Optical signal transmission network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states GPT LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shipley, Simon Paul 8 Rigley Cottage, Grecian Street Aylesbury, Bucks / GB | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Hoste, Colin Francis, et al Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Hoste, Colin Francis, et al Marconi Intellectual Property Marrable House The Vineyards Gt. Baddow Chelmsford Essex CM2 7QS / GB | ||
Former [1994/44] | Wood, John Irwin The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300610.6 | 27.01.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | GB19930001753 | 29.01.1993 Original published format: GB 9301753 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622912 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622912 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G01M11/3154 (EP,US);
G01M11/3136 (EP,US);
H04B10/071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Optisches Signalübertragungsnetzwerk | [1994/44] | English: | Optical signal transmission network | [1994/44] | French: | Réseau de transmission de signaux optiques | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.02.2002 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0432734 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8; | [A]EP0499529 (NIPPON TELEGRAM & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1,2,8; | [A]EP0117868 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1,2,8 |