EP0612634 - Methods of operating a refrigeration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanson, Jay Lowell 4402 West 98th St. Cir. Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300810.2 | 03.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | US19930015964 | 08.02.1993 Original published format: US 15964 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0612634 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0612634 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612634 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
B60H1/3208 (EP,US);
B60H1/3222 (EP,US);
F25B27/00 (EP,US);
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25D11/003 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/50] |
Former [1994/35] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kühlanlage | [1997/29] | English: | Methods of operating a refrigeration system | [1994/35] | French: | Procédés de fonctionnement d'un système de réfrigération | [1994/35] |
Former [1994/35] | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kühleranlage | Examination procedure | 04.03.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 01.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.1994 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5105096 (WALDSCHMIDT JOHN E [US], et al) [AD] 1-3 * column 2, line 17 - line 42; figure . *; | [AD]US4811569 (WELCH DENNIS E [US], et al) [AD] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0522847 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS62268726 ; | [A]JPS62279115 ; | [AD]US5123252 (HANSON JAY L [US]) [AD] 30-32 * figure -; claims 1,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880510), vol. 12, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 694), & JP62268726 A 19871121 (DIESEL KIKI) [A] 9,10,20-25,27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880514), vol. 12, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 697), & JP62279115 A 19871204 (DIESEL KIKI) [A] 9,10,20-25,27 * abstract * |