EP0611127 - Mounting arrangement for a lid or door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 50735 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 D-50735 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thwaites, Paul Michael 9 Sunnyside, Dunton Hills Basildon, Essex SS16 6TF / GB | 02 /
Davies, David Huw 34, Dorset Avenue Chelmsford, Essex / GB | 03 /
Rooke, David 18 Foster Road, Great Totham Maldon, Essex CM9 8PZ / GB | 04 /
Dobson, Alan 170, Abbots Drive Stanford-le-Hope, Essex SS17 7BW / GB | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300895.3 | 07.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | GB19930002513 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: GB 9302513 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611127 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611127 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/20 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
E05B77/44 (EP);
E05B83/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/33] | Title | German: | Montieranordnung für ein Schloss einer Kofferraumklappe oder einer Tür | [1994/33] | English: | Mounting arrangement for a lid or door lock | [1994/33] | French: | Arrangement de montage d'une serrure d'une capot ou d'une porte | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4212176 (HEGEDUS) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]FR2280770 (ATWOOD VACUUM MACHINE COMPANY) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3868836 (LA ROCHE) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [DA]US4041741 (CINTRON) [DA] 1 * column W * |