EP0621602 - Random access memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albon, Richard The Retreat, Mary Tavy Tavistock, Devon / GB | 02 /
Williams, David 16 Hermitage Road, Mannamead Plymouth PL3 4RH Devon / GB | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Hoste, Colin Francis Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Hoste, Colin Francis The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301874.7 | 16.03.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | GB19930008208 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9308208 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0621602 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0621602 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/419, G11C7/06 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G11C11/419 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/43] | G11C11/419 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1994/43] | Title | German: | Direktzugriffspeicher | [1994/43] | English: | Random access memory | [1994/43] | French: | Mémoire à accès aléatoire | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/39] | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3588537 (BRINK ROBERT E) [Y] 1-3,6 * abstract * * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]GB2251325 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 4 * page 6, line 13 - page 10, line 25; figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0383080 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 52 - column 8, line 54; figures 3-5 * | [DY] - SEEVINCK ET AL, "Current Mode Techniques for High Speed VLSI Circuits with Application to Current Sense Amplifier for CMOS SRAMs", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, NEW YORK US, (199104), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/4.75050, pages 525 - 535, XP000216723 [DY] 1-3,6 * page 528, column L, line 25 - page 529, column L, line 12; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.75050 |