EP0622963 - Apparatus for adaptively tuning to a received periodic signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asghar, Safdar M. 7010 Quill Leaf Cove Austin, Texas 78750 / US | 02 /
Zhou, Yan 921-A Sirocco Drive Austin, Texas 78745 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302270.7 | 29.03.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930054408 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: US 54408 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622963 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622963 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/457, H04Q1/30, H04Q1/46 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
H04Q1/4575 (EP,US);
H04Q1/30 (EP,US);
H04Q1/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/44] | H04Q1/457 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur adaptiven Abstimmung auf ein empfangenes periodisches Signal | [1994/44] | English: | Apparatus for adaptively tuning to a received periodic signal | [1994/44] | French: | Dispositif pour l'accordement adaptif à un signal périodique reçu | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/48] | 26.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4326261 (PEOPLES JOHN T) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US4438504 (FAVIN DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US4715000 (PREMERLANI WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [DA]US4839842 (PYI HWA-SHENG [US], et al) [DA] 1-18* abstract * |