EP0634188 - An intra-luminal expander assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETA GROUP Inc 3000 Sand Hill Road, Building 1 Suite 235 Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states BETA GROUP Inc 3000 Sand Hill Road, Building 1 Suite 235 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krumme, John F. P O Box 625 Tahoe City, California 96145 / US | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302652.6 | 14.04.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | US19930048352 | 15.04.1993 Original published format: US 48352 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634188 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634188 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61M25/00 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Dehnen von Körperhölen | [1995/03] | English: | An intra-luminal expander assembly | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif de dilation des cavités du corps | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04200565 ; | [A]US3557794 (PATTEN ROBERT E VAN) [A] 1,2,4,6,9,10,13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0408198 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]WO9205829 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * abstract * * page 8, line 11 - line 31 * * page 18, line 25 - line 33 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921104), vol. 16, no. 533, Database accession no. (C - 1002), & JP04200565 A 19920721 (OLYMPUS OPTIC. CO. LTD.) [A] 1,4,7,11,12 * abstract * |