EP0620184 - Multipurpose wine bottle stopper removing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINE PAL INC. 5375 Brendan Lane Oldcastle Ontario NOR 1LO / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states WINE PAL INC. 5375 Brendan Lane Oldcastle, Ontario NOR 1LO / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
St. Denis, Andrew R. 5331 - 5th Concession Amherstburg, Ontario N8V 2Y9 / CA | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, John William Maurice CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [1994/42] | Application number, filing date | 94302671.6 | 14.04.1994 | [1994/42] | Priority number, date | US19930046816 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: US 46816 | US19930164792 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: US 164792 | [1994/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620184 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B67B7/06 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
B67B7/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/42] | Title | German: | Mehrzweckstopfen-Ziehvorrichtung für Weinflaschen | [1994/42] | English: | Multipurpose wine bottle stopper removing device | [1994/42] | French: | Tire-bouchon multifonctionnel pour bouteilles de vin | [1994/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/04] | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4756214 (VALTRI FRANK J [US], et al) [DA] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US4606245 (VEVERKA JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 7 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE164199 (FLEISCHMANN) [A] 7 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3938707 (SCHLÜTER) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2342156 (HENRY MILLER JOHN) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |