EP0621550 - Method and apparatus for processing signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | [2001/02] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapeli, Juha Fyysikontie 4 SF-90570 Oulu / FI | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Frain, Timothy John, et al Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Frain, Timothy John, et al Nokia Mobile Phones, St. George's Court, St. George's Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302712.8 | 15.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | FI19930001831 | 23.04.1993 Original published format: FI 931831 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0621550 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0621550 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621550 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/184 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
G06G7/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/35] |
Former [1994/43] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Signalverarbeitung | [1994/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for processing signals | [1994/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement de signaux | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0473436 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4695751 (DE LA PLAZA ALEJANDRO [IT]) [A] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0378360 (TELEDYNE IND [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 26, line 16 - line 33; figure 17 * * column 20, line 9 - column 23, line 6; figure 11A *; | [A]EP0039076 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |