EP0622422 - Compositions for construction materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shutt, John Richard Eikenstraat 111 B-3080 Tervuren / BE | 02 /
Touzard, Benoit Marie Francois 29 Rue des Goelands F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303009.8 | 26.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | GB19930008883 | 29.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9308883 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622422 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/09] |
Former [1994/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen für Baumaterialien | [1994/44] | English: | Compositions for construction materials | [1994/44] | French: | Compositions de matériaux de construction | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 27.05.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/35] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.1994 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1994 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2374356 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [D]US4263186 (BLUEEMEL HARALD); | [A]EP0131397 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 16 - page 12, line 8; claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0315239 (ENICHEM ANIC SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 22 - line 54; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0321189 (POLYSAR LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 49 - page 4, line 17; example -; claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB2219802 (VULCANITE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 15; claim 1 * |