EP0622748 - A method for generating artificial shadow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCITEX CORPORATION LTD. 7 Hamada Street Herzliya 46103 / IL | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yosefi, Hanan 73 Rothschild Street Rishon Lezion 75202 / IL | 02 /
Armoni, Shimon R. 5 Hashiva Street Netanya 42036 / IL | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303108.8 | 28.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930056077 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: US 56077 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622748 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622748 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/72 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G06T15/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von artifiziellem Schatten | [1994/44] | English: | A method for generating artificial shadow | [1994/44] | French: | Procédé pour la génération d'ombre artificielle | [1994/44] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.08.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - HSU P ET AL, "Superposing images with shadow casting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST IEEE CONFERENCE ON VISUALIZATION. VISUALIZATION '90 (CAT. NO.90CH2914-0), SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 23-26 OCT. 1990, ISBN 0-8186-2083-8, 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PRESS, USA, pages 298 - 306 [X] 2,6,10-12 * page 300, paragraph 4; figure 3 * [Y] 1,3,9 | [X] - JANSEN F W ET AL, "A shadow algorithm for CSG", COMPUTERS & GRAPHICS, 1991, UK, ISSN 0097-8493, vol. 15, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0097-8493(91)90077-U, pages 237 - 247, XP026650042 [X] 2,6,10-12 * page 237, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0097-8493(91)90077-U | [X] - ROY G G ET AL, "SR: a PC-based CAD system for shadow and reflection studies in the built environment", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, OCT. 1989, UK, ISSN 0010-4485, vol. 21, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/0010-4485(89)90057-2, pages 497 - 504, XP000088131 [X] 2,6,10-12 * paragraph: "shadow and reflection construction" *;; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(89)90057-2 | [Y] - "Method to permit selective shading of graphic object", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, UK, no. 257, page 423 [Y] 1,3,9 * The whole document * |