EP0624339 - An apparatus for and method of exciting magnetic resonance in a limited subregion of an examination region [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Medical Systems, Inc. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights Ohio 44143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Marconi Medical Systems, Inc. 595 Miner Road Highland Heights, Ohio 44143 / US | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states PICKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, Ohio 44143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasuboski, Larry 33450 Wagon Wheel Drive Solon, Ohio, 44139 / US | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/18] | McGowan, Nigel George, et al The General Electric Company plc GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1994/46] | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303162.5 | 29.04.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | US19930060860 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: US 60860 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624339 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624339 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624339 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, G01R33/48 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
G01R33/446 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/46] | A61B5/055 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/46] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Anregen von Kernspinresonanz in einer begrenzten Unterregion einer Untersuchungsregion | [2002/03] | English: | An apparatus for and method of exciting magnetic resonance in a limited subregion of an examination region | [1994/46] | French: | Appareil pour exciter une résonance magnétique nucléaire dans une section d'une région d'un examen médical et méthode pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1994/46] |
Former [1994/46] | Apparat zum Anregen einer NMR in einer begrenzten Subregion einer Untersuchungsregion und Methode zur Durchführung | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | [2006/32] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0256779 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1,3,4,18; | [DA]US4985677 (PAULY JOHN M [US]) [DA] 1-4,14,18; | [DA]US5025216 (PAULY JOHN M [US], et al) [DA] 1-4,14,18; | [DA]US5105152 (PAULY JOHN M [US]) [DA] 1-4,14,18; | [PA]US5270653 (PAULY JOHN M [US])[PA] 1-4,14,18 | Examination | - HARDY C.J. ET AL., "Correcting for Nonuniform k-Space Sampling in Two-Dimensional NMR Selective Excitation", J.MAGN.RES., (1990), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2364(90)90323-2, pages 639 - 645, XP023962030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2364(90)90323-2 | - PAULY J. ET AL., "A k-Space Analysis of Small-Tip-Angle Excitation", J.MAGN.RES., (1989), vol. 81, pages 43 - 56 |