EP0632582 - Operational amplifier and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brehmer, Geoffrey E. 1711 Gracy Farms Lane Austin, Texas 78758 / US | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303244.1 | 05.05.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | US19930085898 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: US 85898 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632582 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632582 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
H03F3/45076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/01] | Title | German: | Operationsverstärker und Verfahren dazu | [1995/01] | English: | Operational amplifier and method | [1995/01] | French: | Amplificateur opérationnel et procédé correspondant | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.07.1998 | FR | 29.07.1998 | GR | 29.07.1998 | IT | 29.07.1998 | NL | 29.07.1998 | DK | 29.10.1998 | PT | 29.10.1998 | SE | 29.10.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 29.07.1998 | |
FR | 29.07.1998 | ||
GR | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 29.07.1998 | |
GR | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
DK | 29.10.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 29.07.1998 | |
GR | 29.07.1998 | ||
NL | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 29.07.1998 | |
GR | 29.07.1998 | ||
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 29.07.1998 | |
PT | 29.10.1998 | ||
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 29.10.1998 | |
SE | 29.10.1998 | ||
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 24.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0028932 (RCA CORP [US]) [A] * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 28; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5006817 (BABANEZHAD JOSEPH N [US]) [Y] 1,9,10 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US5015966 (MCINTYRE HARRY J [US]) [A] * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 65; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0493335 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] * column 2, line 48 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [Y] - HIDETOSHI ONODERA ET AL, "Analog circuit placement -branche-and-bound placement with shape optimization-", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1992 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, BOSTON, US, (19920503), pages 11.5.1 - 11.5.6, XP000340891 [Y] 1,9,10 * page 11.5.5; figure 7 * | [A] - J. F. DUQUE-CARRILLO ET AL, "A family of bias circuits for high input swing CMOS operational amplifiers", 1992 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19920510), vol. 6, pages 3021 - 3024, XP000338847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1992.230685 | by applicant | US5006817 |