EP0626768 - High capacity optical fiber network and fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/48] | High capacity optical fiber network | ||
[2005/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chraplyvy, Andrew R. 32 Somerset Place Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US | 02 /
Tkach, Robert William 27 Westwood Road Little Silver, New Jersey 07739 / US | [2006/28] |
Former [1994/48] | 01 /
Chraplyvy, Andrew R. 32 Somerset PLace Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US | ||
02 /
Tkach, Robert William 27 Westwood Road Little Silver, New Jersey 07739 / US | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1994/48] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303537.8 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | US19930069952 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: US 69952 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626768 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626768 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
H04B10/2525 (EP,US);
H04B10/255 (EP,US);
H04B10/2563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1994/48] | Title | German: | Lichtwellenleiternetzwerk mit hoher Kapazität und Lichtwellenleiter | [2005/47] | English: | High capacity optical fiber network and fiber | [2005/47] | French: | Réseau à fibres optiques à haute capacité et fibre | [2005/47] |
Former [1994/48] | Lichtwellenleiternetzwerk mit hoher Kapazität | ||
Former [1994/48] | High capacity optical fiber network | ||
Former [1994/48] | Réseau à fibres optiques à haute capacité | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.10.2006 | [2007/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0531210 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 3,4,6 * column 1, line 18 - line 31 * * column 2, line 26 - line 43 * * column 3, line 13 - line 36 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 18 - line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0532388 (ALCATEL CABLE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 33 - line 38 * * column 1, line 47 - line 53 * * column 2, line 2 - line 23 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 12 ** column 3, line 25 - line 32 *; | [Y]FR2681745 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 12,13 * page 2, line 20 - line 22 * * page 6, line 5 - line 15 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, line 4 - line 21 * * figure 1 *; | [XY] - MARCUSE, "Single-channel operation in very long nonlinear fibres with optical amplifiers at zero dispersion", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199103), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/50.70012, pages 356 - 361, XP000206865 [X] 1,2,5,7,10,11,14 * page 356, column L, line 1 - column R, line 3 * * page 356, column R, line 33 - line 35 * * page 359, column R, line 8 - line 19 * * figure 8 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,9,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.70012 | [YA] - MARCUSE ET AL, "Effect of fibre nonlinearity on long-distance transmission", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, US, (199101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/50.64931, pages 121 - 128, XP001151813 [Y] 8,9 * page 121, column R, line 9 - line 13 * * page 125, column R, line 38 - line 48 * * page 126, column R, line 29 - page 127, column L, line 8 * * page 126, column L, line 13 - line 20 * [A] 1-7,9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.64931 | Examination | US4969710 | EP0554714 | EP0590633 | - WAARTS R.G. ET AL: 'Nonlinear Effects in Coherent Multichannel Transmission Through Optical Fibers', Proceedings of The IEEE, 78(1990), No. 8, New Yotk, US; pp. 1344. | - OHASHI ET AL, "Dispersion-Modified Single-Mode Fiber by VAD Method", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, SECTION E, TOKYO JP, (199004), vol. E73, no. 4, pages 571 - 575 |