EP0626477 - Trap device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOVER LIMITED Dragonparc, Abercanaid Merthyr Tydfil Mid Glamorgan CF48 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states HOOVER LIMITED Dragonparc, Abercanaid Merthyr Tydfil, Mid Glamorgan CF48 1PQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Jeffrey 57 Brecon Rise, Pant, Merthyr Tydfil Mid Glamorgan, CF48 2EE / GB | [1995/01] |
Former [1994/48] | 01 /
Williams, Jeffrey 50 Anthony Grove, Abercanaid, Merthyr Tydfil Mid Glamorgan, CF48 1XY / GB | Representative(s) | Gibson, Stewart Harry Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Gibson, Stewart Harry URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303656.6 | 23.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | GB19930010618 | 22.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9310618 | GB19930018642 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9318642 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626477 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626477 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/10 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
D06F39/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/48] | Title | German: | Fallevorrichtung | [1994/48] | English: | Trap device | [1994/48] | French: | Trappe | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2116633 (SEDELEM) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 9 - line 27; figures 1-3; claims 1,2,7 * [A] 4,12; | [DYA]DE2110444 (HOOVER LTD) [DY] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3; figures 5,6; claim 1 * [A] 4,12; | [A]US3228525 (EVANS JOHN T, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 14; figures 6,7; claim 1 *; | [A]US4485645 (MULDER JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 63; figures 1,2; claim 1 * |