EP0636969 - Method for providing an extensible set of auxiliary services for objects in an object-oriented system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/05] | Method and apparatus for providing an extensible set of auxiliary services for objects in an object-oriented system | ||
[1999/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radia, Sanjay R. 883 Boar Circle Fremont, California 94539 / US | 02 /
Powell, Michael L. 2305 Emerson Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 03 /
Nelson, Michael N. 158 Hillcrest Road San Carlos, Califonia 94070 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303658.2 | 23.05.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | US19930094455 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: US 94455 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0636969 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0636969 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636969 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G06F9/4488 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
|
Former IPC [1995/05] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Gruppe erweiterbarer Zusatzdienste für Objekte in einem objektoriertierten System | [2000/27] | English: | Method for providing an extensible set of auxiliary services for objects in an object-oriented system | [1999/42] | French: | Procédé pour fournir un ensemble extensible de services auxiliaires pour des objets dans un système orienté objet | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/05] | Verfahren und Gerät zum Erzeugen einer Gruppe erweiterbarer Zusatzdiensten für Objekte in einem objektoriertierten System | ||
Former [1995/05] | Method and apparatus for providing an extensible set of auxiliary services for objects in an object-oriented system | ||
Former [1995/05] | Procédé et dispositif pour fournir un ensemble extensible des services auxiliaires pour des objets dans un système orienté objet | Examination procedure | 01.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0501610 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-12* page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 16 * | [A] - "Object Data Manager", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199003), vol. 32, no. 10A, pages 55 - 57 [A] 1 * the whole document * |