EP0627714 - Apparatus for settling transactions by card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Katsumi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Chizuo, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Mori, Seiji, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 04 /
Terada, Kyouko, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 05 /
Haseba, Asako, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 06 /
Asai, Rieko 1655-2, Nogaya-cho Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-01 / JP | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane, London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303832.3 | 26.05.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930126440 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12644093 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0627714 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0627714 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627714 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06F15/00, G07G1/00, G07G1/14 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
G06Q20/047 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/342 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3576 (EP,US);
G06Q20/387 (EP,US);
G06Q20/389 (EP,US);
G07F7/025 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | G07F7/10, G06F15/21, G07G1/00, G07G1/14 | ||
Former IPC [1994/49] | G07F7/10, G06F15/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Transaktions-Abrechnung mittels einer Karte | [1994/49] | English: | Apparatus for settling transactions by card | [1994/49] | French: | Dispositif pour le réglement de transactions par carte | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0253240 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,14-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 7, line 39 * * figures 1,4,8,11,12 * [A] 8 [Y] 6,7,13; | [Y]US5200889 (MORI KUNIO [JP]) [Y] 6,7,13 * column 2, line 5 - line 40 * * column 4 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 5 * * column 13, line 34 - line 50 * * figures 2,3,11,19-22 * |