EP0632198 - A spark plug having a fuel injector valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takahiro, c/o N G K Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-ban, 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi / JP | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304074.1 | 07.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | JP19930161471 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: JP 16147193 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632198 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632198 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02M57/06 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
F02M51/08 (EP);
F02M57/06 (EP);
F02B2275/14 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/01] | Title | German: | Zündkerze mit Kraftstoffeinspritzventil | [1995/01] | English: | A spark plug having a fuel injector valve | [1995/01] | French: | Bougie d'allumage comportant un injecteur de combustible | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4127456 (UWEGAS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 26; figure . * [A] 3-5; | [Y]US2255203 (WIEGAND FRANCIS J) [Y] 1,2,7 * page 1, column R, line 44 - page 2, column L, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3980061 (MCALISTER ROY E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 66; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0307651 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |