EP0628954 - Method and apparatus for reproducing and recording information on an optical disc and light detecting apparatus used in the reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoh, Makoto, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Hiroyuki, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/50] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304075.8 | 07.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | JP19930137690 | 08.06.1993 Original published format: JP 13769093 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0628954 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0628954 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628954 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/13 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/131 (EP,US);
G11B7/24088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe von Informationen auf einer optischen Platte sowie Lichtdetektionsvorrichtung dazu | [1994/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for reproducing and recording information on an optical disc and light detecting apparatus used in the reproducing apparatus | [1994/50] | French: | Méthode et appareil de reproduction et d'enregistrement d'information sur disque optique, et détecteur de lumière utilisé dans cet appareil | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0394461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6-10 * figures 12,13; claims 1,7,11 *; | [A]EP0540345 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,10 * figures 6-12,16-18; claims 7-16 *; | [A]US4142098 (KORPEL ADRIANUS) [A] 1,6,7,10 * figures 1,2,5; claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0553573 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,3,5-7,9,10 * figures 6-10,13,14,19; claims 1-10 * |