EP0628569 - Triterpene derivatives and endothelin-receptor antagonists containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konoike, Toshiro 15-8 Uchihonmachi 3-chome Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Araki, Yoshitaka 23-5-809, Kano 7-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Tetsuyoshi Residence YK 303, 15-28, Kokubu 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakurai, Kensuke 19-21, Ojicho-honmachi 5-chome Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Tozyo, Takehiko, 11-501-2304 Naka 5-chome, Koyo-cho, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304165.7 | 09.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | JP19930140416 | 11.06.1993 Original published format: JP 14041693 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628569 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628569 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, A61K31/705, A61K35/78 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
C07C233/33 (EP,US);
C07J63/00 (KR);
A61K31/565 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | Triterpenderivate und diese enthaltende Endothelinrezeptor Antagonisten | [1994/50] | English: | Triterpene derivatives and endothelin-receptor antagonists containing the same | [1994/50] | French: | Dérivés triterpènes et antagonistes du récepteur d'endothéline les contenant | [1994/50] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/37: Teilanmeldung 95112524.4 eingereicht am 09/08/95 | EPB 1996/37: Divisional application 95112524.4 filed on 09/08/95 | EPB 1996/37: Demande divisionnaire 95112524.4 déposée le 09/08/95 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95112524.4 / EP0682009 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]WO9212991 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]); | [A]EP0526642 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |