EP0629945 - System and method for emulating multi-tasking pipelines in a single tasking environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/51] | System for emulating multi-tasking pipelines in a single tasking environment | ||
[1998/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venable, Denis A. 55 Academy Drive Rochester, New York 14623 / US | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Xerox Limited Patents Department Xerox Technical Centre Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts AL7 1HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304303.4 | 14.06.1994 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | US19930076679 | 15.06.1993 Original published format: US 76679 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0629945 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0629945 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629945 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F9/44 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
G06F9/544 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/51] | G06F9/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/51] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Emulierung von Vielfachprozess-Pipelines in einer Einprozessumgebung | [1998/09] | English: | System and method for emulating multi-tasking pipelines in a single tasking environment | [1998/09] | French: | Système et méthode pour émuler des pipelines multi-tâches dans un environnement à tâche unique | [1998/09] |
Former [1994/51] | System zur Emulierung von Vielfachprozess-Pipelines in einer Einprozessumgebung | ||
Former [1994/51] | System for emulating multi-tasking pipelines in a single tasking environment | ||
Former [1994/51] | Système pour émuler des pipelines multi-tâches dans un environnement à tâche unique | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0357444 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * Abstract * * figure 3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0433472 (SIEMENS AG [DE])[A] 1-10; | [A]US5175854 (CHEUNG BALDWIN K [US], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]EP0536073 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A] - J. B. DENNIS, "Static Data Flow Computation", CONTROL FLOW AND DATA FLOW: CONCEPTS OF DISTRIBUTED PROGRAMMING, (1987), pages 355 - 363, XP000042335 [A] 1-10 |