EP0632086 - A method of producing a semiconducting material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Oil Co., Ltd. 1-3-12, Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO., LTD. 1-3-12, Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikai, Keizo 8 Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuno, Mitsuo 8 Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Minami, Masaki 8 Chidori-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al G.F. Redfern & Co., 7 Staple Inn, Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1995/01] | Topley, Paul, et al G.F. Redfern & Co. Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304431.3 | 17.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | JP19930172358 | 18.06.1993 Original published format: JP 17235893 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0632086 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0632086 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632086 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/60 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C08G77/60 (EP);
H01B1/06 (EP);
H01L21/02422 (EP);
H01L21/02532 (EP);
H01L21/02628 (EP);
H10K85/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/01] | C08G77/60, C09D183/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleitermaterials | [1995/01] | English: | A method of producing a semiconducting material | [1995/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un matériau semiconducteur | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.1998 | Decision despatched | 18.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 14.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0515281 ; | [A]JPH0528282 ; | [A]EP0264722 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0282037 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]EP0445306 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-8 * * page 2, line 3 - line 27 * * page 4, line 17 - line 33 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-080486, & JPH0515281 A 19930202 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-080487, & JPH0528282 A 19930202 (NIPPON TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH) [A] 1 * abstract * |